Council | 11/03/2023 | Act A25-0276 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014480, Expires on Jan 28, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/31/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/30/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0276, Expires on Jan 28, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2023 | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 10/02/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |