Council | 11/24/2023 | Act A25-0297 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015229, Expires on Feb 13, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/20/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 11/15/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0297, Expires on Feb 13, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/13/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 28, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 11/01/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |