Council | 12/22/2023 | Act A25-0328 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016077, Expires on Mar 13, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/14/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 12/14/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0328, Expires on Mar 13, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/30/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 14, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Amendment (Allen) | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (T. White) | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 11/16/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |