8 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
| 3 | + | _____________________________ 1 |
---|
| 4 | + | Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | A BILL 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | _________ 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | __________________ 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | To amend, on an emergency basis, An Act To provide a People’s Counsel for the Public 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | Service Commission in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes to extend 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | the allowable holdover period of the People ’s Counsel until a successor takes office. 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | act may be cited as the “ People’s Counsel Holdover Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | 2023”. 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | Sec. 2. Section 1 of An Act To provide a People’s Counsel for the Public Service 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | Commission in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes, approved January 2, 1975 (88 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | Stat. 1975; D.C. Official Code 34- 804), is amended by adding a new subsection (b- 1) to read as 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | follows: 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | “(b-1) Notwithstanding subsection (b) of this section and section 2(c) of the Confirmation 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1- 523.01(c)), a 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | person appointed to the People’s Counsel may serve in a holdover capacity after the expiration of 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | his or her term until his or her successor takes office.” . 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | Sec. 3. Applicability. 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | Section 2 shall apply as of December 5, 2023. 33 2 |
---|
10 | | - | ________________ |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | ________________________ |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | |
---|
18 | | - | To amend, on an emergency basis, An Act To provide a People’s Counsel for the Public |
---|
19 | | - | Service Commission in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes to extend |
---|
20 | | - | the allowable holdover period of the People ’s Counsel until a successor takes office. |
---|
21 | | - | |
---|
22 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
23 | | - | act may be cited as the “ People’s Counsel Holdover Extension Emergency Amendment Act of |
---|
24 | | - | 2023”. |
---|
25 | | - | |
---|
26 | | - | Sec. 2. Section 1 of An Act To provide a People’s Counsel for the Public Service |
---|
27 | | - | Commission in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes, approved January 2, 1975 (88 |
---|
28 | | - | Stat. 1975; D.C. Official Code 34- 804), is amended by adding a new subsection (b- 1) to read as |
---|
29 | | - | follows: |
---|
30 | | - | “(b-1) Notwithstanding subsection (b) of this section and section 2(c) of the Confirmation |
---|
31 | | - | Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1- 523.01(c)), a |
---|
32 | | - | person appointed to the People’s Counsel may serve in a holdover capacity after the expiration of |
---|
33 | | - | his or her term until his or her successor takes office.” . |
---|
34 | | - | |
---|
35 | | - | Sec. 3. Applicability. |
---|
36 | | - | Section 2 shall apply as of December 5, 2023. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec 4. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
39 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
40 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
41 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
43 | | - | Sec. 5. Effective date. |
---|
44 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
45 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
46 | | - | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | 2 |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; |
---|
54 | | - | D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). |
---|
55 | | - | |
---|
56 | | - | |
---|
57 | | - | |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Chairman |
---|
60 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
61 | | - | |
---|
62 | | - | |
---|
63 | | - | |
---|
64 | | - | |
---|
65 | | - | |
---|
66 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Mayor |
---|
68 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
69 | | - | |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | |
---|
| 37 | + | Sec 4. Fiscal impact statement. 34 |
---|
| 38 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | Sec. 5. Effective date. 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). 43 |
---|