District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0582 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 12/05/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
________________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, An Act To provide a People’s Counsel for the Public  
Service Commission in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes to extend  
the allowable holdover period of the People ’s Counsel until a successor takes office. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “	People’s Counsel Holdover Extension Emergency 	Amendment Act of 
2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 1 of An Act To provide a People’s Counsel for the Public Service 
Commission in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes, approved January 2, 1975 (88 
Stat. 1975; D.C. Official Code 34-	804), is amended by adding a new subsection (b-	1) to read as 
follows: 
 “(b-1) Notwithstanding subsection (b) of this section and section 2(c) of the Confirmation 
Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-	523.01(c)), a 
person appointed to the People’s Counsel may serve in a holdover capacity after the expiration of 
his or her term until his or her successor takes office.”	. 
 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 
Section 2 shall apply as of December 5, 2023. 
 
Sec 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section     	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)).  
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia