Council | 02/02/2024 | Act A25-0374 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001211, Expires on Apr 24, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/26/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 01/25/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0374, Expires on Apr 24, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/17/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 31, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Amendment (Lewis George) | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 11/27/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |