Council | 11/26/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/20/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 11/18/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 11/18/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0587 | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0587 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 11/29/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |