Council | 12/29/2023 | Act A25-0337 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016590, Expires on Mar 20, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/22/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 12/21/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0337, Expires on Mar 20, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2023 | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 12/04/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |