Council | 03/13/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 03/11/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/23/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/16/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0609 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 11/30/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |