Council | 11/01/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 11/01/2024 | Act A25-0607 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 013018 | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/28/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0607 | ||
Council | 10/15/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 29, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/30/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Agendized; not considered at the request of Not Considered (Chairman Mendelson) | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0636 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/20/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 03/15/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/12/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/22/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 01/26/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/25/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 12/29/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0636 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/20/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |