Council | 01/26/2024 | Act A25-0370 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001021, Expires on Apr 11, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/12/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 01/12/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0370, Expires on Apr 11, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/11/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 01/08/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |