District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0644 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/09/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
________________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_____________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Confirmation Act of 1978 and the Historic Landmark and 
Historic District Protection Act of 1978 to allow members of the Historic Preservation 
Review Board to continue to serve in a hold-over capacity for up to 225 days. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Historic Preservation Review Board Succession Emergency Amendment 
Act of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 2(c) of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01(c)), is amended by striking the phrase “and commissions” 
and inserting the phrase “and commissions; except, that members of the Historic Preservation 
Review Board may serve in a hold-over capacity for up to 225 days” in its place. 
 
Sec. 3. Section 4(b)(4) of the Historic Landmark and Historic District Protection Act of 
1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-144; D.C. Official Code § 6-1103(b)(4)), is amended 
by striking the phrase “180 days” and inserting the phrase “225 days” in its place. 
 
 Sec. 4. Applicability.  
 This act shall apply as of January 15, 2024. 
 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).   
 
 Sec. 6. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia