District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0644 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/08/2024

                     ________________	_______________ 1 
 Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
 8 
_________ 9 
 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
__________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Confirmation Act of 1978 and the Historic Landmark and 17 
Historic Protection Act of 1978 to allow members of the Historic Preservation Review 18 
Board to continue to serve until a successor has been confirmed and appointed. 19 
 20 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 
act may be cited as the “Historic Preservation Review Board Succession Emergency Amendment 22 
Act of 2024”. 23 
 Sec. 2. Section 2(c) of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 24 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01(c)), is amended by striking the phrase “and commissions” 25 
and inserting the phrase “and commissions, provided that members of the Historic Preservation 26 
Review Board may serve in a hold-over capacity for up to 225 days” in its place. 27 
Sec. 3. Section 4(b)(4) of the Historic Landmark and Historic Protection Act of 1978, 28 
effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-144; D.C. Official Code § 6-1103(b)(4)) is amended by 29 
striking the phrase “180 days” and inserting the phrase “225 days” in its place. 30 
 Sec. 4. Applicability.  31 
 This act shall apply as of January 15, 2024. 32 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 33   The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 34 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 35 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).   36 
 Sec. 6.  Effective date. 37 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 38 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 39 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 40 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 41 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 42