Council | 10/24/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/22/2024 | Public Hearing | ||
Council | 10/18/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor | ||
Council | 01/12/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0659 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor | ||
Council | 01/08/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |