1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | 1 |
---|
3 | 3 | | _______________________________ _______________________________ 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | Councilmember Vincent C. Gray Councilmember Trayon White, Sr. 2 |
---|
5 | 5 | | 3 |
---|
6 | 6 | | 4 |
---|
7 | 7 | | 5 |
---|
8 | 8 | | 6 |
---|
9 | 9 | | 7 |
---|
10 | 10 | | 8 |
---|
11 | 11 | | 9 |
---|
12 | 12 | | 10 |
---|
13 | 13 | | 11 |
---|
14 | 14 | | A BILL 12 |
---|
15 | 15 | | ________ 13 |
---|
16 | 16 | | 14 |
---|
17 | 17 | | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 15 |
---|
18 | 18 | | _________________________ 16 |
---|
19 | 19 | | 17 |
---|
20 | 20 | | To amend the District of Columbia Traffic Adjudication Act of 1978 to authorize the Department 18 |
---|
21 | 21 | | of Motor Vehicles to establish an amnesty program to waive monetary penalties upon the 19 |
---|
22 | 22 | | payment of fines owed as a result of notices of infractions for parking, standing, and 20 |
---|
23 | 23 | | stopping violations issued prior to January 1, 2024, to waive monetary penalties upon the 21 |
---|
24 | 24 | | payment of fines owed as a result of notices of infractions issued through automated 22 |
---|
25 | 25 | | traffic enforcement systems prior to January 1, 2024, to permit persons owing such debt 23 |
---|
26 | 26 | | to obtain vehicle registration, and to exempt such debt from the Clean Hands Act. 24 |
---|
27 | 27 | | 25 |
---|
28 | 28 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 26 |
---|
29 | 29 | | act may be cited as the “Ticket Amnesty Amendment Act of 2024”. 27 |
---|
30 | 30 | | Sec. 2. Section 901(a) of Title IX of the Fiscal Year 1997 Budget Support Act of 1996, 28 |
---|
31 | 31 | | effective April 9, 1997 (D.C. Law 11-198; D.C. Official Code §50-2209.01 (a) is amended to 29 |
---|
32 | 32 | | read as follows: 30 |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) The existing text is designated as paragraph (1), 31 |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) A new paragraph (2) is added to read as follows: 32 |
---|
35 | 35 | | “(2) the Mayor is authorized to establish a six month ticket amnesty 33 |
---|
36 | 36 | | program that shall run at least six months consecutively and begin no more than sixty days 34 |
---|
37 | 37 | | from the date of approval of this Act. The amnesty program shall apply to all notices of 35 |
---|
38 | 38 | | infraction for parking, stopping, and standing violations issued prior to January 1, 2024 and all 36 |
---|
39 | 39 | | 2 |
---|
40 | 40 | | automated traffic enforcement violations issued prior to January 1, 2024. During this period, 37 |
---|
41 | 41 | | any person who pays or agrees to pay the outstanding initial fines with respect to such 38 |
---|
42 | 42 | | violations shall have all monetary penalties waived.” 39 |
---|
43 | 43 | | (b) Section 303 of the District of Columbia Traffic Adjudication Act of 1978, 40 |
---|
44 | 44 | | approved September 12, 1978 (D.C. Law D. 2-104; D.C. Official Code § 50-2303.03) is 41 |
---|
45 | 45 | | amended by adding a new subsection (f) to read as follows: 42 |
---|
46 | 46 | | “(f) Notwithstanding paragraph (b) of this section, the Mayor is authorized to 43 |
---|
47 | 47 | | establish a six month ticket amnesty program that shall run at least six months consecutively 44 |
---|
48 | 48 | | and begin no more than sixty days from the date of approval of this Act. The amnesty 45 |
---|
49 | 49 | | program shall apply to all notices of infraction for parking, stopping, and standing violations 46 |
---|
50 | 50 | | issued prior to January 1, 2024 and all automated traffic enforcement violations issued prior to 47 |
---|
51 | 51 | | January 1, 2024. During this period, any person who pays or agrees to pay the outstanding 48 |
---|
52 | 52 | | initial fines with respect to such violations shall have all monetary penalties waived.”. 49 |
---|
53 | 53 | | (c) Section 2(a) of An Act to provide additional revenue for the District of 50 |
---|
54 | 54 | | Columbia, and for other purposes, approved August 17, 1937 (50 Stat. 680; D.C. Official 51 |
---|
55 | 55 | | Code §50-1501.02(a)) is amended as follows: 52 |
---|
56 | 56 | | (1) The existing text is designated as paragraph (1). 53 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (2) A new paragraph (2) is added to read as follows: 54 |
---|
58 | 58 | | “(2) Registration shall be issued if the owner has paid all applicable 55 |
---|
59 | 59 | | fines, fees, and taxes for the motor vehicle or trailer pursuant to this subchapter; except, that 56 |
---|
60 | 60 | | registration shall not be denied as a result of outstanding fines and penalties resulting from 57 |
---|
61 | 61 | | notices of infraction for parking, standing, and stopping violations issued before January 1, 58 |
---|
62 | 62 | | 2024.”. 59 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 3 |
---|
64 | 64 | | (d) Section 47-2861 (a)(1)(C) of the District of Columbia Official Code is 60 |
---|
65 | 65 | | amended to read as follows: 61 |
---|
66 | 66 | | (1) Subparagraph (B) is amended by striking the word “or” at the end. 62 |
---|
67 | 67 | | (2) Subparagraph (C) is amended by striking the period and inserting the 63 |
---|
68 | 68 | | phrase “; or” in its place. 64 |
---|
69 | 69 | | (3) A new subparagraph (D) is added to read as follows: 65 |
---|
70 | 70 | | “(D) Any motor vehicle registration issued pursuant to § 50-66 |
---|
71 | 71 | | 1501.02.”. 67 |
---|
72 | 72 | | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 68 |
---|
73 | 73 | | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 69 |
---|
74 | 74 | | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 70 |
---|
75 | 75 | | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 71 |
---|
76 | 76 | | Sec. 4. Effective date. 72 |
---|
77 | 77 | | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 73 |
---|
78 | 78 | | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 74 |
---|
79 | 79 | | provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 75 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 76 |
---|
81 | 81 | | Columbia Register. 77 |
---|