District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0666 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/09/2024

                             
 	1 
_______________________________                      _______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Vincent C. Gray       Councilmember Trayon White, Sr.             2 
 3 
 4 
  5 
        6 
 7 
 8 
 9 
 10 
 11 
A BILL 12 
________ 13 
 14 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 15 
_________________________ 16 
 17 
To amend the District of Columbia Traffic Adjudication Act of 1978 to authorize the Department 18 
of Motor Vehicles to establish an amnesty program to waive monetary penalties upon the 19 
payment of fines owed as a result of notices of infractions for parking, standing, and 20 
stopping violations issued prior to January 1, 2024, to waive monetary penalties upon the 21 
payment of fines owed as a result of notices of infractions issued through automated 22 
traffic enforcement systems prior to January 1, 2024, to permit persons owing such debt 23 
to obtain vehicle registration, and to exempt such debt from the Clean Hands Act. 24 
 25 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 26 
act may be cited as the “Ticket Amnesty Amendment Act of 2024”. 27 
Sec. 2. Section 901(a) of Title IX of the Fiscal Year 1997 Budget Support Act of 1996, 28 
effective April 9, 1997 (D.C. Law 11-198; D.C. Official Code §50-2209.01 (a) is amended to 29 
read as follows: 30 
 (1) The existing text is designated as paragraph (1),  31 
 (2) A new paragraph (2) is added to read as follows: 32 
 “(2) the Mayor is authorized to establish a six month ticket amnesty 33 
program that shall run at least six months consecutively and begin no more than sixty days 34 
from the date of approval of this Act. The amnesty program shall apply to all notices of 35 
infraction for parking, stopping, and standing violations issued prior to January 1, 2024 and all 36   
 	2 
automated traffic enforcement violations issued prior to January 1, 2024.  During this period, 37 
any person who pays or agrees to pay the outstanding initial fines with respect to such 38 
violations shall have all monetary penalties waived.” 39 
  (b) Section 303 of the District of Columbia Traffic Adjudication Act of 1978, 40 
approved September 12, 1978 (D.C. Law D. 2-104; D.C. Official Code § 50-2303.03) is 41 
amended by adding a new subsection (f) to read as follows: 42 
 “(f) Notwithstanding paragraph (b) of this section, the Mayor is authorized to 43 
establish a six month ticket amnesty program that shall run at least six months consecutively 44 
and begin no more than sixty days from the date of approval of this Act. The amnesty 45 
program shall apply to all notices of infraction for parking, stopping, and standing violations 46 
issued prior to January 1, 2024 and all automated traffic enforcement violations issued prior to 47 
January 1, 2024.  During this period, any person who pays or agrees to pay the outstanding 48 
initial fines with respect to such violations shall have all monetary penalties waived.”. 49 
  (c) Section 2(a) of An Act to provide additional revenue for the District of 50 
Columbia, and for other purposes, approved August 17, 1937 (50 Stat. 680; D.C. Official 51 
Code §50-1501.02(a)) is amended as follows: 52 
 (1) The existing text is designated as paragraph (1). 53 
 (2) A new paragraph (2) is added to read as follows: 54 
 “(2) Registration shall be issued if the owner has paid all applicable 55 
fines, fees, and taxes for the motor vehicle or trailer pursuant to this subchapter; except, that 56 
registration shall not be denied as a result of outstanding fines and penalties resulting from 57 
notices of infraction for parking, standing, and stopping violations issued before January 1, 58 
2024.”. 59   
 	3 
 (d) Section 47-2861 (a)(1)(C) of the District of Columbia Official Code is 60 
amended to read as follows: 61 
 (1) Subparagraph (B) is amended by striking the word “or” at the end. 62 
 (2) Subparagraph (C) is amended by striking the period and inserting the 63 
phrase “; or” in its place. 64 
 (3) A new subparagraph (D) is added to read as follows: 65 
 “(D) Any motor vehicle registration issued pursuant to § 50-66 
1501.02.”.  67 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 68 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 69 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 70 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 71 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 72 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 73 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 74 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 75 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 76 
Columbia Register. 77