District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0673 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/05/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_________  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_________________  
 
 
To approve, on an emergency basis, Modifications 1 through 4 to Contract No. GF-2021-C-0009 
between the University of the District of Columbia and Bailey’s Real Estate Holdings, 
LLC, and to authorize payment for the janitorial services received and to be received 
under the contract. 
  
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA , that this 
act may be cited as the “University of the District of Columbia Modifications 1- 4 to Contract 
No. GF 2021-C-0009 with Bailey’s Real Estate Holdings, LLC Approval and Payment 
Authorization Emergency Act of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the Home Rule Act (D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51) 
and notwithstanding the requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 
2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council 
approves Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, and 4 to Contract No. GF-2021-C-0009 with Bailey’s Real 
Estate Holdings, LLC, to provide labor, materials, equipment, and supervision to provide 
janitorial services to all of the University of the District of Columbia facilities and authorizes 
payment in the not-to-exceed amount of $2,999,950 under Option Year One for the goods and 
services received from October 1, 2021 through September 30, 2022, payment in the not-to-
exceed amount of $2,999,950 under Option Year Two for goods and services received from 
October 1, 2022 through September 30, 2023, and payment in the not-to exceed amount of 
$2,999,950 under Option Year Three for goods and services received and to be received from 
October 1, 2023 through September 30, 2024. 
 
 Sec.3. Fiscal impact statement. 
  The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 6, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code §1-301.47a). 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
Sec.4. Effective date. 
  This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). . 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia