Council | 03/01/2024 | Act A25-0402 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002099, Expires on May 22, 2024 | ||
Council | 02/26/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/22/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0402, Expires on May 22, 2024 | ||
Council | 02/12/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 27, 2024 | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 02/05/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |