District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0676 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/06/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment 
Initiative of 1999 to provide a deadline date by which existing cultivation centers and 
dispensaries must file their applications with ABCA for additional medical cannabis 
facility licenses, to not allow a cultivation center to also hold an internet retailer license, 
to provide that the 2 cultivation center registration applicants that tied for second and 
received the same total score after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration 
application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between November 29, 2021 and 
March 28, 2022, be awarded a cultivation center registration, to provide that other  
cultivation center and dispensary registration applicants that scored 150 points or more 
after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to the Alcoholic 
Beverage Control Board during the same open application period shall be considered for 
a cultivation center or retailer registration, and to allow a cultivation center and 
dispensary registration applicant that scored 150 points or more to change the location of 
its facility without otherwise affecting the status of its application.  
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Supplemental Emergency Amendment 
Act of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 
1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is 
amended as follows: 
(a) Subsection (d) is amended as follows: 
 (1) Paragraph (2) is amended by striking the phrase “retailer or online retailer 
license” and inserting the phrase “retailer license” in its place. 
 (2) A new paragraph (5) is added to read as follows: 
 “(5) Applications for additional licenses pursuant to paragraphs (1) through (3) of 
this subsection shall be filed with ABCA by the existing cultivation center or dispensary by May 
1, 2024.”.     	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
(b) Subsection (e)(1) is amended as follows 
 (1) Subparagraph (F) is amended by striking the phrase “retailer or internet 
retailer license” and inserting the phrase “retailer license” in its place. 
 (2) A new subparagraph (G) is added to read as follows: 
 “(G) No licensee holding a cultivation center license shall hold an internet 
retailer license.”.  
(c)  New subsections (w) and (x) are added to read as follows:  
 “(w)(1) The 2 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted a medical cannabis 
facility registration application to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 
2022, that tied for second and received the same total score shall be awarded a cultivation center 
registration.  
 “(2) A cultivation center registration applicant not referenced in paragraph (1) of 
this subsection that scored 150 points or more during the same open application period shall be 
considered for a cultivation center registration after May 1, 2023; provided, that the applicant 
files a corrected application, including an application to change the facility location, with the 
ABC Board by May 1, 2024. An applicant that scored 150 points or higher shall be allowed to 
change the location of the cultivation center facility on its application by May 1, 2024, without 
negatively affecting the status of the application.  
 “(3) An applicant that filed more than one cultivation center registration 
application during the open application period with one or more of the same owners shall be 
considered for only one cultivation center registration under this subsection.   
 “(4) An initial application fee paid by a cultivation center registration applicant 
that scored 150 points or higher shall be credited by ABCA toward the entire cost of the 
applicant’s cultivation center application fee. 
“(x)(1) A dispensary registration applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility 
registration application to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, 
and received 150 points or more shall be considered for a retailer registration no earlier than 180 
calendar days after March 22, 2023. An applicant shall be allowed to change the location of the 
retailer facility on its application by May 1, 2024, without negatively affecting the status of the 
application.  
 “(2) An applicant that filed more than one dispensary registration application 
during the open application period with one or more of the same owners shall be considered for 
only one retailer registration under this subsection.   
 “(3) An initial application fee paid by a dispensary registration applicant that 
scored 150 points or higher shall be credited by ABCA toward the entire cost of the applicant’s 
retailer application fee.”. 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).   
 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia