Council | 04/12/2024 | Act A25-0436 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004116, Expires on Jun 27, 2024 | ||
Council | 03/29/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/29/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0436, Expires on Jun 27, 2024 | ||
Council | 03/15/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 29, 2024 | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/04/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |