Council | 06/14/2024 | Law L25-0171, Effective from Jun 01, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007002, Expires on Jan 12, 2025 | ||
Council | 04/26/2024 | Act A25-0453 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004654 | ||
Council | 04/19/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 04/17/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 04/15/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0453 | ||
Council | 04/08/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 22, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/08/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0724 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/04/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |