1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | 1 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | _____________________________ _____________________________ 1 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
6 | 6 | | 3 |
---|
7 | 7 | | 4 |
---|
8 | 8 | | _____________________________ ______________________________ 5 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Councilmember Charles Allen Councilmember Brooke Pinto 6 |
---|
10 | 10 | | 7 |
---|
11 | 11 | | 8 |
---|
12 | 12 | | _____________________________ 9 |
---|
13 | 13 | | Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 10 |
---|
14 | 14 | | 11 |
---|
15 | 15 | | 12 |
---|
16 | 16 | | 13 |
---|
17 | 17 | | A BILL 14 |
---|
18 | 18 | | 15 |
---|
19 | 19 | | ______________ 16 |
---|
20 | 20 | | 17 |
---|
21 | 21 | | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 18 |
---|
22 | 22 | | 19 |
---|
23 | 23 | | ________________ 20 |
---|
24 | 24 | | 21 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 22 |
---|
26 | 26 | | To amend the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act of 1985 to require 23 |
---|
27 | 27 | | continuing education requirements for the practice of medicine, registered nursing, 24 |
---|
28 | 28 | | practical nursing, nursing assistive personnel, and physician assistants to include firearm 25 |
---|
29 | 29 | | injury prevention and intervention education. 26 |
---|
30 | 30 | | 27 |
---|
31 | 31 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 28 |
---|
32 | 32 | | act may be cited as the “Firearm Injury Prevention Amendment Act of 2024”. 29 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Sec. 2. Section 510(b) of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act of 30 |
---|
34 | 34 | | 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3-1205.10(b)), is amended 31 |
---|
35 | 35 | | by adding a new paragraph (6) to read as follows: 32 |
---|
36 | 36 | | “(6)(A) Except as provided in subsection (b-1) of this section, require that any 33 |
---|
37 | 37 | | continuing education requirements for the practice of medicine, the practice of registered 34 |
---|
38 | 38 | | nursing, the practice of practical nursing, the practice by nursing assistive personnel, and the 35 |
---|
39 | 39 | | practice of physician assistants licensed or registered under this section include: 36 |
---|
40 | 40 | | 2 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | “(i) The relationship between depression, suicidal ideation, and 37 |
---|
43 | 43 | | gun suicide; 38 |
---|
44 | 44 | | “(ii) The relationship between domestic violence and gun violence; 39 |
---|
45 | 45 | | “(iii) Appropriate interventions and resources for depression, 40 |
---|
46 | 46 | | domestic violence, and suicide prevention; 41 |
---|
47 | 47 | | “(iv) Firearm injury risk factors; 42 |
---|
48 | 48 | | “(v) Safe storage of firearms and ammunition; 43 |
---|
49 | 49 | | “(vi) Extreme risk protection orders pursuant to section 1003 of the 44 |
---|
50 | 50 | | Firearms Control Regulations Act of 1975, effective May 10, 2019 (D.C. Law 22-314; D.C. 45 |
---|
51 | 51 | | Official Code § 7–2510.03); and 46 |
---|
52 | 52 | | “(vii) Best practices for discussing firearm access and safety 47 |
---|
53 | 53 | | during patient visits. 48 |
---|
54 | 54 | | “(B) For the purposes of this paragraph, the term: 49 |
---|
55 | 55 | | “(i) “Ammunition” shall have the same meaning as provided in 50 |
---|
56 | 56 | | section 101(2) of the Firearms Control Regulations Act of 1975, effective September 24, 1976 51 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (D.C. Law 1-85; D.C. Official Code § 7-2501.01(2)). 52 |
---|
58 | 58 | | “(ii) “Domestic violence” shall have the same meaning as provided 53 |
---|
59 | 59 | | in section 3032(1) of the Domestic Violence Hotline Establishment Act of 2013, effective 54 |
---|
60 | 60 | | December 24, 2013 (D.C. Law 20-61; D.C. Official Code § 4-551(1)). 55 |
---|
61 | 61 | | “(iii) “Firearm injury risk factors” means characteristics or 56 |
---|
62 | 62 | | conditions that increase the likelihood of engaging in firearm violence.”. 57 |
---|
63 | 63 | | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 58 |
---|
64 | 64 | | 3 |
---|
65 | 65 | | |
---|
66 | 66 | | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 59 |
---|
67 | 67 | | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 60 |
---|
68 | 68 | | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 61 |
---|
69 | 69 | | Sec. 4. Effective date. 62 |
---|
70 | 70 | | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 63 |
---|
71 | 71 | | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 64 |
---|
72 | 72 | | provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 65 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 66 |
---|
74 | 74 | | Columbia Register. 67 |
---|