District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0751 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/20/2024

                             
1 
 
_____________________________  _____________________________ 1 
Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr.  2 
 3 
 4 
_____________________________            ______________________________ 5 
Councilmember Charles Allen             Councilmember Brooke Pinto 6 
 7 
 8 
 _____________________________ 9 
       Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 10 
            11 
 12 
 13 
A BILL 14 
 15 
______________ 16 
 17 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 18 
 19 
________________                               20 
 21 
 22 
To amend the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act of 1985 to require 23 
continuing education requirements for the practice of medicine, registered nursing, 24 
practical nursing, nursing assistive personnel, and physician assistants to include firearm 25 
injury prevention and intervention education. 26 
 27 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 28 
act may be cited as the “Firearm Injury Prevention Amendment Act of 2024”. 29 
 Sec. 2. Section 510(b) of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act of 30 
1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3-1205.10(b)), is amended 31 
by adding a new paragraph (6) to read as follows: 32 
 “(6)(A) Except as provided in subsection (b-1) of this section, require that any 33 
continuing education requirements for the practice of medicine, the practice of registered 34 
nursing, the practice of practical nursing, the practice by nursing assistive personnel, and the 35 
practice of physician assistants licensed or registered under this section include: 36   
2 
 
 “(i) The relationship between depression, suicidal ideation, and 37 
gun suicide; 38 
 “(ii) The relationship between domestic violence and gun violence; 39 
 “(iii) Appropriate interventions and resources for depression, 40 
domestic violence, and suicide prevention; 41 
 “(iv) Firearm injury risk factors; 42 
 “(v) Safe storage of firearms and ammunition; 43 
 “(vi) Extreme risk protection orders pursuant to section 1003 of the 44 
Firearms Control Regulations Act of 1975, effective May 10, 2019 (D.C. Law 22-314; D.C. 45 
Official Code § 7–2510.03); and 46 
 “(vii) Best practices for discussing firearm access and safety 47 
during patient visits. 48 
 “(B) For the purposes of this paragraph, the term: 49 
 “(i) “Ammunition” shall have the same meaning as provided in 50 
section 101(2) of the Firearms Control Regulations Act of 1975, effective September 24, 1976 51 
(D.C. Law 1-85; D.C. Official Code § 7-2501.01(2)). 52 
 “(ii) “Domestic violence” shall have the same meaning as provided 53 
in section 3032(1) of the Domestic Violence Hotline Establishment Act of 2013, effective 54 
December 24, 2013 (D.C. Law 20-61; D.C. Official Code § 4-551(1)). 55 
 “(iii) “Firearm injury risk factors” means characteristics or 56 
conditions that increase the likelihood of engaging in firearm violence.”.  57 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 58   
3 
 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 59 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 60 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 61 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 62 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 63 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 64 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 65 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 66 
Columbia Register.  67