Council | 06/07/2024 | Act A25-0489 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006775, Expires on Sep 01, 2024 | ||
Council | 06/03/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 06/03/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0489, Expires on Sep 01, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/21/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 3, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 05/06/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |