Council | 09/13/2024 | Law L25-0204, Effective from Sep 04, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 010775, Expires on Apr 17, 2025 | ||
Council | 09/04/2024 | Law Number L25-0204 Effective from Sep 04, 2024, Expires on Apr 17, 2025 | ||
Council | 07/26/2024 | Act A25-0507 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009323 | ||
Council | 07/23/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 07/18/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/18/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0507 | ||
Council | 07/08/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 22, 2024 | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/14/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0808 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Pinto Motion to Postpone to June 11, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 05/06/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |