Council | 09/27/2024 | Law L25-0210, Effective from Sep 18, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 011535, Expires on May 01, 2025 | ||
Council | 08/09/2024 | Act A25-0531 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009936 | ||
Council | 08/06/2024 | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 07, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/31/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/26/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0531 | ||
Council | 07/19/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/24/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |