District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0858 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
1+ ENGROSSED ORIGINAL
22
33
44
55 1
66
7-AN ACT
8-
9-__________
10-
11-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-______________________
14-
15-
16-To enact on a temporary basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on
17-voluntary agreements.
18-
19-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may
20-be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”.
21-
22-Sec. 2. Section 215a(a) of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C.
23-Law 6-10; D.C. Official Code § 42-3502.15a(a)), is amended by striking the phrase “for one year
24-beginning on October 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “before January 1, 2025” in its place.
25-
26-Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.
27-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
28-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
29-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
30-
31- Sec. 4. Effective date.
32- (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by
33-the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto) and a 30-day period of congressional
34-review as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
35-
36-
37-
38-
39-
40-
41-
42-
43-
44-
45- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
7+A BILL 1
8+ 2
9+25-858 3
10+ 4
11+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5
12+ 6
13+______________________ 7
14+ 8
15+ 9
16+To enact on a temporary basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on 10
17+voluntary agreements. 11
18+ 12
19+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 13
20+be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”. 14
21+Sec. 2. The Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6-10; D.C. 15
22+Official Code § 42-3502.15a(a)), is amended by striking the phrase “for one year beginning on 16
23+October 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “before January 1, 2025” in its place. 17
24+Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 18
25+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 19
26+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 20
27+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 21
28+ Sec. 4. Effective date. 22
29+ (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 23
30+the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 24
31+as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 25 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL
4632
4733
4834
4935 2
5036
51-December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)).
52- (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having effect.
53-
54-
55-
56-______________________________
57-Chairman
58-Council of the District of Columbia
59-
60-
61-
62-
63-_________________________________
64-Mayor
65-District of Columbia
66-
67-
37+24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 26
38+Columbia Register. 27
39+ (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having effect. 28
40+ 29