Council | 11/08/2024 | Act A25-0602 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 013489, Expires on Jan 23, 2025 | ||
Council | 10/25/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/25/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0602, Expires on Jan 23, 2025 | ||
Council | 10/16/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 30, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 09/30/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |