LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
District Of Columbia DC
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Council
Bills
B25-1008
Action History
DC
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1008
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1008
Action History
Council
11/25/2024
Returned from Mayor
Council
11/22/2024
Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0630, Expires on Feb 20, 2025
Council
11/08/2024
Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 25, 2024
Council
10/29/2024
Final Reading, CC
Council
10/29/2024
Retained by the Council
Council
10/28/2024
Introduced in Office of the Secretary