District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1008 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
1+1
42
53 1
4+Chairman Phil Mendelson 2
5+ 3
6+ 4
7+ 5
8+ 6
9+ 7
10+ 8
11+ A BILL 9
12+ 10
13+ 11
14+ 12
15+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13
16+ 14
17+ 15
18+ 16
19+ 17
20+To order, on an emergency basis due to congressional review, the closing of a 10-foot-wide 18
21+unimproved public alley in Square 3701 abutting Lots 85 and 88 in Northeast 19
22+Washington, D.C. in Ward 5. 20
23+ 21
24+ BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22
25+act may be cited as the “Closing of a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23-06220, Congressional 23
26+Review Emergency Act of 2024”. 24
27+ Sec. 2. (a) Pursuant to section 404 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 25
28+December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 787; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.04), and consistent with the Street 26
29+and Alley Closing and Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 27
30+4-201; D.C. Official Code § 9-201.01 et seq.), the Council finds that the portion of public alley in 28
31+Square 5051, as shown on the Surveyor’s plat filed under S.O. 21-00136, is unnecessary for alley 29
32+purposes and orders it closed with title to the land to vest as shown on the Surveyor’s plat. 30
33+ (b) The ordering of this alley closing is contingent upon the property owner receiving the 31
34+requisite public space approvals for parking and loading access prior to the recordation of the 32
35+plat by the Surveyor. 33 2
636
7-AN ACT
8-
9-_____________
10-
11-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-__________________________
14-
15-
16-To order, on an emergency basis due to congressional review, the closing of a 10- foot-wide
17-unimproved public alley in Square 3701 abutting Lots 85 and 88 in Ward 5.
18-
19- BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
20-act may be cited as the “ Closing of a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23- 06220, Congressional
21-Review Emergency Act of 2024”.
22-
23- Sec. 2. (a) Pursuant to section 404 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
24-December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 787; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.04), and consistent with the Street
25-and Alley Closing and Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law
26-4-201; D.C. Official Code § 9- 201.01 et seq .), the Council finds that a portion of the public alley
27-system in Square 3701, as shown on the Surveyor’s plat filed under S.O. 23 -06220, is
28-unnecessary for alley purposes and orders it closed with title to the land to vest as shown on the
29-Surveyor’s plat.
30- (b) The ordering of this alley closing is contingent upon the property owner receiving the
31-requisite public space approvals for parking and loading access prior to the recordation of the
32-plat by the Surveyor.
33-
34- Sec. 3. Applicability date.
35- This act shall apply as of October 24, 2024.
36-
37- Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.
38- The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report for the Closing of
39-a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23- 06220, Act of 2024, enacted on October 28, 2024 (D.C.
40-Act 25-607; 71 DCR ____), as the fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General
41-Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official
42-Code § 1- 301.47a).
43-
44- Sec. 5. Effective date.
45- This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by
46-the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-2
51-
52-than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in
53-section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87
54-Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)).
55-
56-
57-
58-______________________________
59-Chairman
60-Council of the District of Columbia
61-
62-
63-
64-
65-
66-_________________________________
67-Mayor
68-District of Columbia
69-
70-
71-
72-
37+ Sec. 3. Applicability date. 34
38+ This act shall apply as of October 24, 2024. 35
39+ Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 36
40+ The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 37
41+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 38
42+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 39
43+ Sec. 5. Effective date. 40
44+ This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by 41
45+the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer 42
46+than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in 43
47+section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 44
48+Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 45