Council | 11/08/2024 | Act A25-0622 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 013558, Expires on Feb 02, 2025 | ||
Council | 11/05/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 11/04/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0622, Expires on Feb 02, 2025 | ||
Council | 11/01/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 18, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Amendment (CM Pinto) | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 10/28/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |