District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1012 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/28/2024

                    1 
 
 
 __________________________ 
          Councilmember Brooke Pinto 
 
 
A BILL 1 
 2 
_________________________ 3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
_________________________ 7 
 8 
 9 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Residential Tranquility Act of 2010 to prohibit persons 10 
targeting a residence for purposes of a demonstration from using amplified sound devices 11 
in a residential zone, to prohibit a person as part of a group of 3 or more persons from 12 
targeting a residence for purposes of a demonstration between 7:00 p.m. and 9:00 a.m., 13 
and to prohibit a person from launching or throwing a projectile onto the residential 14 
property of another with the intent to cause fear, intimidate, or retaliate against any 15 
person living or working at that residence; and to amend the National Capital 16 
Revitalization and Self-Government Improvement Act of 1997 to provide that the term 17 
expiration date for a Council appointment to the Corrections Information Council shall be 18 
December 7th of the year in which the term expires. 19 
 20 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 
act may be cited as the “Residential Tranquility Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 22 
 Sec. 2. The Residential Tranquility Act of 2010, effective May 26, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-23 
374; D.C. Official Code § 22-2751 et seq.), is amended as follows: 24 
(a) Section 2 (D.C. Official Code § 22-2751) is amended by adding a new paragraph (4) 25 
to read as follows: 26 
“(4) “Sound amplifying device” means any machine, device, or loudspeaker that 27 
amplifies sound of the human voice, music, or any other sound. The term “sound amplifying 28 
device” shall not include automobile audio systems when used and heard only by the occupants 29  2 
 
of the vehicle in which the automobile audio system is installed, personal hearing aids, or 30 
headphones.”. 31 
(b) Section 3 (D.C. Official Code § 22-2752) is amended as follows: 32 
(1) Subsection (a)(1)(A) is amended by striking the phrase “Between 10:00 p.m. 33 
and 7:00 a.m” and inserting the phrase “Between 7:00 p.m. and 9:00 a.m.” in its place. 34 
(2) New subsections (a-1) and (a-2) are added to read as follows: 35 
“(a-1) It is unlawful for a person to target a residence for purposes of a demonstration 36 
while using a sound amplifying device in Residential Zones, Residential Flat Zones, or 37 
Residential Apartment Zones, as those terms are defined in the District of Columbia Zoning 38 
Regulations. 39 
“(a-2) It is unlawful to continue or resume targeting a residence in violation of this law 40 
after being instructed by a law enforcement officer to cease targeting a residence in violation of 41 
this law.”. 42 
(c) A new section 3a is added to read as follows: 43 
“ Sec. 3a. Throwing projectiles at residential property. 44 
“(a) It is unlawful for any person to launch or throw a projectile onto the residential 45 
property of another with the intent to cause fear, intimidate, or retaliate against any person living 46 
or working at that residence.”.  47 
“(b) A person who violates this section, upon conviction, shall be fined no more than the 48 
amount set forth in section 101 of the Criminal Fine Proportionality Amendment Act of 2012, 49 
effective June 11, 2013 (D.C. Law 19-317; D.C. Official Code § 22-3571.01), or incarcerated for 50 
no more than 90 days, or both.”.  51 
Sec. 3. Section 11201a(b)(2) of the National Capital Revitalization and Self-Government 52  3 
 
Improvement Act of 1997, effective October 2, 2010 (D.C. Law 18-233; D.C. Official Code § 53 
24-101.01(b)(2)),  is amended by adding a new subparagraph (B-1) to read as follows: 54 
  “(B-1) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the term expiration 55 
date for a Council appointment to the Corrections Information Council shall be December 7th of 56 
the year in which the term expires.”. 57 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 58 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 59 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 60 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 61 
 Sec. 5.  Effective date. 62 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 63 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 64 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 65 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 66 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 67