District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1053 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 12/03/2024

                              ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
__________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, 	due to congressional review, 	the District of Columbia Public 
Works Act of 1954 to clarify that an owner or occupant of property in the District shall pay 
an impervious area charge that the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority d/b/a 
DC Water (“DC Water”) assesses; and to amend the Water and Sewer Authority 
Establishment and Department of Public Works Reorganization Act of 1996 to clarify that 
DC Water may assess an impervious area charge on any property in the District. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “CRIAC Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act 
of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. The District of Columbia Public Works Act of 1954, approved May 18, 1954 (68 
Stat. 104; D.C. Official Code § 34-	2101 et seq.), is amended as follows: 
 (a) Section 207 (D.C. Official Code § 34-	2107) is amended as follows: 
 (1) Subsection (a)(1) is amended to read as follows:  
 “(1) A billing methodology that takes into account both the water consumption of, 
and water service to, a property where water is supplied from the District water supply system.”.  
 (2) Subsection (c) is repealed. 
 (b) Section 208 (D.C. Official Code § 34-	2108) is amended by adding a new subsection 
(d) to read as follows: 
 “(d) The owner or occupant of each property in the District shall pay any impervious area 
charge that the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority establishes pursuant to section 
216(c-1) of the Water and Sewer Authority Establishment and Department of Public Works 
Reorganization Act of 1996, effective April 18, 1996 (D.C. Law 11-	111; D.C. Official Code § 34-
2202.16(c-1)).”.  
 
 Sec. 3. Section 216 of the Water and Sewer Authority Establishment and Department of 
Public Works Reorganization Act of 1996, effective April 18, 1996 (D.C. Law 11-	111; D.C. 
Official Code § 34-	2202.16), is amended as follows: 
 (a) A new subsection (c-	1) is added to read as follows:    ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 “(c-1)(1)(A) The Authority shall assess an impervious area charge on any property in the 
District based on a billing methodology that takes into account the amount of impervious surface 
on a property that either prevents or retards the entry of water into 	the ground as occurring under 
natural conditions, or that causes water to run off the surface in greater quantities or at an increased 
rate of flow, relative to the flow present under natural conditions.  
  “(B) For the purposes of this paragraph, the term “surface” includes 
rooftops, footprints of patios, driveways, private streets, other paved areas, athletic courts and 
swimming pools, and any path or walkway that is covered by impervious material. 
 “(2) The impervious area charge shall be the obligation of the property owner. 
Failure to pay the impervious area charge shall result in a lien being placed upon the property 
without further notice to the owner. The Mayor may enforce the lien in the same manner as in 
section 104 of the District of Columbia Public Works Act of 1954, approved May 18, 1954 (68 
Stat. 102; D.C. Official Code § 34-	2407.02). 
 “(3) Any owner or occupant of a property that is assessed an impervious area charge 
may contest an impervious area charge bill according to the same procedures provided to owners 
or occupants of properties that receive water and sewer service under section 1805 of the District 
of Columbia Public Works Act of 1954, approved June 13, 1990 (D.C. Law 8-	136; D.C. Official 
Code § 34- 2305).”. 
 (b) Subsection (e) is amended by striking the phrase “including the” and inserting the 
phrase “including the impervious area charge and the” in its place.  
 
 Sec. 4. Applicability.  
 This act shall apply as of March 25, 2009. 
 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 6. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
    ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
3 
 
 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
 
 
___________________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia