District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1072 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55
66
77
88
99 MURIEL BOWSER
1010 MAYOR
1111
1212
1313 December 11, 2024
1414
1515 The Honorable Phil Mendelson
1616 Chairman
1717 Council of the District of Columbia
1818 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 504
1919 Washington, DC 20004
2020
2121 Dear Chairman Mendelson:
2222
2323 Enclosed for consideration by the Council is proposed emergency legislation entitled the “Climate
2424 Commitment Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024” and the “Climate
2525 Commitment Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2024” This legislation will clarify that
2626 the Department of General Services (DGS) is allowed to repair and replace units and component
2727 parts of fossil fuel-based heating and cooling systems.
2828
2929 The current law mandates that the District may not install fossil fuel-based space or water heating
3030 appliances. The law is intended to advance electrification, decreasing fossil fuel consumption
3131 across the District. It is unclear, however, how DGS will continue to maintain existing fossil fuel-
3232 based systems without replacing each system through a modernization or planned whole system
3333 HVAC replacement project. A modernization or whole system HVAC replacement project for any
3434 site requires multiple years to formulate and request a budget; develop, solicit, and evaluate
3535 proposals; perform design review; engage stakeholders; swing occupants to an empty building;
3636 and build or install the project -- all of which must be strategically planned.
3737
3838 To date, the District has over 300 fossil fuel-based space heating appliances alone. There is
3939 insufficient time, budget, and materials to switch every building to an all-electric system. There
4040 would also be significant embodied carbon emissions associated with doing so. Hundreds of fossil
4141 fuel-based systems possess many additional years of useful life to provide heating to the District
4242 through the winter season and beyond.
4343
4444 To wisely steward the District government’s limited resources and achieve the useful life of
4545 existing systems, DGS will replace fossil fuel-based systems with all electric once these systems
4646 are beyond repair or when deemed fully inoperable and appropriate for HVAC replacement.
4747
4848 Approval of the enclosed emergency declaration and approval of the emergency legislation will
4949 facilitate the ongoing maintenance of existing fossil fuel-based systems throughout the District.
5050 I look forward to your prompt and favorable consideration of this resolution. In order to facilitate
5151 a response to any questions you may have, please have your staff contact Director Delano Hunter.
5252
5353
5454
5555 Sincerely,
5656
5757
5858
5959 Muriel Bowser
6060
6161 Enclosures
6262 ~ ~
6363 3 at the request of the Mayor
6464 4
6565 5
6666 6 A BILL
6767 7
6868 8
6969 9
7070 10 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
7171 11
7272 12
7373 13
7474 14
7575 15 To amend, on an emergency basis, the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act
7676 16
7777 of 2005 to clarify that this act does not apply to the replacement of components or units of
7878 1 7 existing space or water heating systems that rely on the combustion of natural gas, oil, or
7979 18 other fossil fuels.
8080 19
8181 20 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
8282 21 act may be cited as the "Climate Commitment Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of
8383 22 2024".
8484 23 Sec.
8585 2. Section 109e(a) of the District Department of the Environment
8686 24 Establishment Act of 2005, effective September 21, 2022 (D.C. Law 24-176; D.C.
8787 25 Official
8888 Code§ 8-151.09e(a)), is amended as follows:
8989 26 (a) The existing text is designated as paragraph (1).
9090 27 (b) Paragraph (1) is amended by:
9191 28 (1) Striking the
9292 word "appliances" and inserting the word "systems" in its
9393 29 place; and
9494 30 (2) Striking the word "appliance" and inserting the word "system" in its
9595 31 place.
9696 32 (c) A new paragraph (2) is added to read as follows: “(2) This subsection does not apply to the replacement of components or 33
9797 units of existing space or water heating systems that rely on the combustion of natural 34
9898 gas, oil, or other fossil fuels at the site of the system.”. 35
9999 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 36
100100 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 37
101101 impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 38
102102 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code §1- 301.47a). 39
103103 Sec. 4 Effective date. 40
104104 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 41
105105 Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 42
106106 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 43
107107 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 44
108108 D.C. Official Code §1- 204.12(a)). 45 Government of the District of Columbia
109109 Office of the Chief Financial Officer
110110
111111 Glen Lee
112112 Chief Financial Officer
113113
114114
115115
116116
117117
118118 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 203, Washington, DC 20004 (202)727-2476
119119 www.cfo.dc.gov
120120 MEMORANDUM
121121
122122 TO: The Honorable Phil Mendelson
123123 Chairman, Council of the District of Columbia
124124
125125 FROM: Glen Lee
126126 Chief Financial Officer
127127
128128 DATE: November 26, 2024
129129
130130 SUBJECT: Fiscal Impact Statement – Climate Commitment Clarification
131131 Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
132132
133133 REFERENCE: Draft bill provided to the Office of Revenue Analysis on November 22,
134134 2024
135135
136136
137137 Conclusion
138138
139139 Funds are sufficient in the fiscal year 2025 through fiscal year 2028 budget and financial plan to
140140 implement the bill.
141141
142142 Background
143143
144144 Beginning January 1, 2025, current law
145145 1 prohibits the District from installing, in District-owned
146146 buildings, space- or water-heating appliances that rely on the combustion of natural gas, oil, or other
147147 fossil fuels at the site of the appliance, except in cases where compliance would be technically
148148 infeasible.
149149
150150 The bill modifies the law to apply to the installation of building systems, not the individual
151151 components or units within existing systems.
152152
153153 Financial Plan Impact
154154
155155 Funds are sufficient in the fiscal year 2025 through fiscal year 2028 budget and financial plan to
156156 implement the bill. Narrowing the application of the requirement from all components of a building
157157 system to the replacement of the whole system does not have an added cost.
158158
159159 1
160160 D.C. Official Code § 8-151.09e(a).  
161161 ______________________________________________________________________________________________________
162162 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 409, Washington, D.C. 20004 Phone (202) 735-7589 Email:
163163 benjamin.moskowitz1@dc.gov
164164  
165165 GOVERNMENT OF THE DIST RICT OF COLUMBIA
166166 Office of the Attorney General
167167
168168
169169
170170
171171
172172 BRIAN L. SCHWALB
173173 A
174174 TTORNEY GENERAL
175175
176176 Legal Counsel Division
177177
178178
179179 TO:   Tomás Talamante
180180 Director
181181 Office of Policy and Legislative Affairs
182182
183183 FROM: Ben Moskowitz
184184 Acting Deputy Attorney General
185185 Legal Counsel Division
186186
187187 DATE:  November 20, 2024
188188
189189 RE: Legal Sufficiency Review of Draft Legislation, the “Climate Commitment
190190 Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2024” and the “Climate
191191 Commitment Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”, and Draft
192192 Resolution, the “Climate Commitment Clarification Emergency Declaration
193193 Resolution of 2024”
194194
195195 (AE-24-397)
196196
197197
198198 This is to Certify that this Office has reviewed the above-
199199 referenced draft legislation and draft resolution and found each to be legally sufficient. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call me at (202) 735-7589.
200200
201201
202202
203203
204204 _________________________________
205205 Ben Moskowitz