District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1072 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/12/2024

                             
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
 
 
December 11, 2024 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
 
Enclosed for consideration by the Council is proposed emergency legislation entitled the “Climate 
Commitment Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024” and the “Climate 
Commitment Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2024” This legislation will clarify that 
the Department of General Services (DGS) is allowed to repair and replace units and component 
parts of fossil fuel-based heating and cooling systems.  
 
The current law mandates that the District may not install fossil fuel-based space or water heating 
appliances. The law is intended to advance electrification, decreasing fossil fuel consumption 
across the District.  It is unclear, however, how DGS will continue to maintain existing fossil fuel-
based systems without replacing each system through a modernization or planned whole system 
HVAC replacement project. A modernization or whole system HVAC replacement project for any 
site requires multiple years to formulate and request a budget; develop, solicit, and evaluate 
proposals; perform design review; engage stakeholders; swing occupants to an empty building; 
and build or install the project -- all of which must be strategically planned.  
 
To date, the District has over 300 fossil fuel-based space heating appliances alone. There is 
insufficient time, budget, and materials to switch every building to an all-electric system. There 
would also be significant embodied carbon emissions associated with doing so. Hundreds of fossil 
fuel-based systems possess many additional years of useful life to provide heating to the District 
through the winter season and beyond. 
 
To wisely steward the District government’s limited resources and achieve the useful life of 
existing systems, DGS will replace fossil fuel-based systems with all electric once these systems 
are beyond repair or when deemed fully inoperable and appropriate for HVAC replacement.  
 
Approval of the enclosed emergency declaration and approval of the emergency legislation will 
facilitate the ongoing maintenance of existing fossil fuel-based systems throughout the District.   
I look forward to your prompt and favorable consideration of this resolution. In order to facilitate 
a response to any questions you may have, please have your staff contact Director Delano Hunter. 
 
 
 
Sincerely, 
 
 
 
Muriel Bowser 
 
Enclosures 
  ~ ~ 
3 	at the request 	of the Mayor 
4 
5 
6 	A BILL 
7 
8 
9 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To amend, on an emergency basis, the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act 
16 
of 2005 to clarify that this act does not apply 	to the replacement of components or units of 
1 7 existing space or water heating systems that rely 	on the combustion of natural gas, oil, or 
18 other fossil fuels. 
19 
20 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
21 act may be cited as the "Climate Commitment Clarification Emergency Amendment Act 	of 
22 2024". 
23 Sec. 
2. Section 109e(a) of the District Department of the Environment 
24 Establishment Act of 2005, effective September 21, 2022 (D.C. 	Law 24-176; D.C. 
25 Official 
Code§ 8-151.09e(a)), is amended as follows: 
26 (a) The existing text is designated as paragraph (1). 
27 (b) Paragraph (1) is amended by: 
28 	(1) Striking the 
word "appliances" and inserting the word "systems" in its 
29 place; and 
30 	(2) Striking the word "appliance" and inserting the 	word "system" in its 
31 place. 
32 (c) A new paragraph (2) is added to read as follows:  “(2) This subsection does not apply to the replacement of components or 33 
units of existing space or water heating systems that rely on the combustion of natural 34 
gas, oil, or other fossil fuels at the site of the system.”.  35 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 36 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 37 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 38 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code §1-	301.47a). 39 
Sec. 4 Effective date. 40 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 41 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 42 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 43 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 44 
D.C. Official Code §1-	204.12(a)). 45  Government of the District of Columbia 
Office of the Chief Financial Officer 
 
Glen Lee 
Chief Financial Officer 
 
 
 
 
 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 203, Washington, DC 20004 (202)727-2476 
www.cfo.dc.gov 
MEMORANDUM 
 
TO:   The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
 Chairman, Council of the District of Columbia 
 
FROM:   Glen Lee 
 Chief Financial Officer 
 
DATE:   November 26, 2024 
 
SUBJECT:  Fiscal Impact Statement – Climate Commitment Clarification 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 
 
REFERENCE:  Draft bill provided to the Office of Revenue Analysis on November 22, 
2024 
 
 
Conclusion 
 
Funds are sufficient in the fiscal year 2025 through fiscal year 2028 budget and financial plan to 
implement the bill.  
 
Background 
 
Beginning January 1, 2025, current law
1 prohibits the District from installing, in District-owned 
buildings, space- or water-heating appliances that rely on the combustion of natural gas, oil, or other 
fossil fuels at the site of the appliance, except in cases where compliance would be technically 
infeasible.   
 
The bill modifies the law to apply to the installation of building systems, not the individual 
components or units within existing systems.  
 
Financial Plan Impact 
 
Funds are sufficient in the fiscal year 2025 through fiscal year 2028 budget and financial plan to 
implement the bill. Narrowing the application of the requirement from all components of a building 
system to the replacement of the whole system does not have an added cost.  
 
1
 D.C. Official Code § 8-151.09e(a).    
______________________________________________________________________________________________________ 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 409, Washington, D.C.  20004  Phone (202) 735-7589  Email: 
benjamin.moskowitz1@dc.gov 
 
GOVERNMENT OF THE DIST RICT OF COLUMBIA 
Office of the Attorney General 
 
 
 
 
 
BRIAN L. SCHWALB      
A
TTORNEY GENERAL      
 
Legal Counsel Division 
 
 
TO:   Tomás Talamante   
  Director  
Office of Policy and Legislative Affairs 
 
FROM: Ben Moskowitz 
 Acting Deputy Attorney General 
  Legal Counsel Division 
 
DATE:  November 20, 2024 
 
RE: Legal Sufficiency Review of Draft Legislation, the “Climate Commitment 
Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2024” and the “Climate 
Commitment Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”, and Draft 
Resolution, the “Climate Commitment Clarification Emergency Declaration 
Resolution of 2024”
 
(AE-24-397) 
 
 
This is to Certify that this Office has reviewed the above-
referenced draft legislation and draft resolution and found each to be legally sufficient.  If 	you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call me at (202) 735-7589. 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Ben Moskowitz