District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill CER25-0080 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/06/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
1 
 
 
A CEREMONIAL RESOLUTION 
 
25-79 
  
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
June 6, 2023 
  
To recognize and celebrate Mount Olive Baptist Church in Northeast, DC, on the occasion of its 
150th anniversary, for its outstanding c	ommitment, dedication, and s ervice to its members 
and the community.  
 
WHEREAS, Mount Olive Baptist Church was established on August 17, 1873, 	after a 
meeting was convened at the home of Brother Robert Terrell; 
 	WHEREAS, the purpose of the new church was to organize a branch from the Second 
Baptist Church of Northwest, and during the meeting, there were prayers, hymn singing, taking up 
of a collection of $1.81, an election of officers, and the naming of a pastor;  
 	WHEREAS, the home of Robert and Martha Terrell was the first place of worship and is 
part of the site where the church currently resides; 
 
WHEREAS, the cornerstone was laid for Mount Olive Baptist Church at 1138 6th Street, 
NE, on February 22, 1916; 
 
WHEREAS, Mount Olive Baptist Church was 	later able to purchase 3 	neighboring 
properties to expand its footprint; 
 
WHEREAS, an annex was dedicated in memory of Deacon Horace Moore, who served as 
Chair of the Deacon Board for 40 years;  
 
WHEREAS, on May 24, 1976, Mount Olive Baptist Church’s current location at 1140 6th 
Street, NE, was occupied and dedicated to God; 
 
WHEREAS, Mount Olive Baptist Church ascribes to the directive found in Proverbs 22:6, 
“train up a child in the way he should go, 	and when he is old, 	he will not depart from it,” and 
thereby established a S	unday school for the purpose of providing a foundat	ion of religious 
education to young minds ; 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
2 
 
WHEREAS, Mount Olive Baptist Church offers prayer service and bible study on 
Wednesdays, along with Sunday school and Sunday worship through YouTube;  
 
WHEREAS, Reverend William Robinson was named the first Pastor of Mount Olive 
Baptist Church and was followed by many outstanding leaders who shepherded Mount Olive 
Baptist Church as Pastor or Assistant Pastor, 	including dedicated men and women of faith like 
Reverends S.J.R. Nelson, B.M. Brown, Frank Graham, Allen 	Skinker, Monroe S. Caver, Roy A. 
Carter, Anthony A. Williams, J.A. Johnson, John Childs, Robert Evans, Isadore Richards, Hilton 
J. Patton, Zaccheus Johnson, Anthony D. Marcus, John Mendenhall, Norman Robinson, 	Delores 
Roberts, Eugene W. James, III, McKinley Battle, Betty Green, and Ronnie L. Stanley, Jr.; 
 
WHEREAS, Mount Olive Baptist Church has never abandoned the District, its original site 
in Northeast, or its community, and has been a beacon for leading many people to God 	through 
community outreach and programs to assist the elderly, families, men, women, and children; 	and 
 
WHEREAS, Mount Olive Baptist Church has been, and remains, an important and integral 
part of the District of Columbia . 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, T	hat this 
resolution may be cited as the “Mount Olive Baptist Church 150th 	Anniversary Recognition 
Resolution of 2023”. 
  
Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia recognizes and celebrates Mount Olive 
Baptist Church in Northeast, DC, on the occasion of its 150th anniversary, for its outstanding 
commitment, dedication, and s	ervice to its members and the community. 
 
Sec. 3. This r esolution shall take effect immediately	.