District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill CER25-0157 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 12/05/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
1 
 
 
A CEREMONIAL RESOLUTION 
 
25-157 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
December 5, 2023 
 
 
To recognize and honor Dr. Grace Holloman Davis	, on the occasion of her 100th birthday, for her 
many years of service to the District as an educator and dedicated advocate of community 
service. 
 
WHEREAS, Dr. Grace Holloman Davis was born in the District on November 8, 1923; 
 
WHEREAS, Dr. Davis’ father was the pastor of Second 	Street Baptist Church located on 
3rd Street, NW, and where she is still an active member today; 
 
WHEREAS, Dr. Davis received her Bachelor’s degree from Miner Teachers College, her 
Master’s degree from the University of Chicago, and her Doctor in Education (Ed.D) degree from 
George Washington University; 
  
WHEREAS, Dr. Davis was a mathematics teacher for several years at Shaw Junior High 
School and Cardozo High School, later becoming the Director of Grants for the District of 
Columbia Public Schools; 
 
WHEREAS, Dr. Davis has also been active in community service with 	her Alpha Kappa 
Alpha sorority for more than 80 years; 
 
WHEREAS, at age 100, Dr. Davis continues her life-long presence and committed service 
to her church, driving to Sunday morning worship service and providing volunteer service at her 
church twice weekly for several hours; 
 
WHEREAS, Dr. Davis provides exceptional support to the Southwest Waterfront Chapter 
of the AARP, and has dedicated herself to the AARP	’s motto of “To Serve, Not To Be Served”; 
and 
 
WHEREAS, Dr. Davis celebrated her 100th birthday on November 8, 2023, with the 
Southwest Waterfront Chapter of the AARP recognizing her at its November 15, 2023 Chapter 
meeting. 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
2 
 
 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the "Dr. Grace Holloman Davis 	100th Birthday Recognition Resolution 
of 2023". 
 
Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia recognizes and honors Dr. Grace Holloman 
Davis, on the occasion of her 100th birthday, for her many years of service to the District as an 
educator and dedicated advocate of community service. 
 
Sec. 3. This resolution shall take effect immediately.