Council | 03/17/2023 | Resolution R25-0067, Effective from Mar 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 003288 | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0067 | ||
Council | 02/15/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 02/14/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0046 | ||
Council | 02/13/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 02/09/2023 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 02/03/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/25/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/13/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0046 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/20/2022 | Referred to Committee on Housing | ||
Council | 12/13/2022 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |