Council | 02/17/2023 | Resolution R25-0053, Effective from Feb 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 002159 | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0053 | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 02/03/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/03/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0063 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/01/2023 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 01/26/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/20/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |