District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0063 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/07/2023

                              ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-53 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 7, 2023 
 To approve the negotiated compensation collective bargaining agreement submitted by the 
Mayor for employees of the District of Columbia Public Schools	, who are represented by 
the Washington Teachers’ Union, Local #6 of the American Federation of Teachers. 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, 	That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Compensation and Working Conditions Agreement between the 
District of Columbia Public Schools and the Washington Teachers’ Union, Local #6 of the 
American Federation of Teachers Approval Resolution of 2023”	. 
 Sec. 2. Pursuant to s ection 1717(j) of the District of Columbia Government 
Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-	139; D.C. 
Official Code § 1- 617.17(j)) , the Council approves the collective bargaining agreement between 
the District of Columbia Public Schools and the Washington Teachers’ Union, Local #6 of the 
American Federation of Teachers, and the associated pay schedules, which the Mayor 
transmitted to the Council on January 20, 2023. 
 
Sec. 3. Transmittal. 
 The Secretary to the Counci	l shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to 
the Washington Teachers’ Union, Local #6 of the American Federation of Teachers and the 
Office of the Mayor. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal i mpact s tatement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975	, 
approved October 16, 2006 (	120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This resolution shall take effect immediately.