12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | February 7, 2023 |
---|
14 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos . |
---|
15 | | - | 5, 6, and 7 to Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 with Sasha Bruce Youthworks , Inc. |
---|
16 | | - | to provide pre - and post-transitional care homes to District youth, and to authorize |
---|
17 | | - | payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the modifications. |
---|
18 | | - | |
---|
19 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
20 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Modifications to Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 with |
---|
21 | | - | Sasha Bruce Youthworks, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration |
---|
22 | | - | Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
23 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification No s. 5, 6, and 7 to |
---|
24 | | - | Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 with Sasha Bruce Youthworks , Inc. to provide pre - and |
---|
25 | | - | post-transitional care homes to District youth and to authorize payment for the goods and |
---|
26 | | - | services received and to be received under the m odifications. |
---|
27 | | - | (b) By Modification No. 5, dated September 20, 2022, the Office of Contracting and |
---|
28 | | - | Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Youth Rehabilitati on Services, exercised a partial |
---|
29 | | - | option year one of Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 for the period from September 22, |
---|
30 | | - | 2022, through December 20, 2022, in the not -to-exceed amount of $618,136.96. |
---|
31 | | - | (c) By Modification No. 6, dated December 15, 2022, the Office of Contracting and |
---|
32 | | - | Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Youth Rehabilitation Services, extended the term |
---|
33 | | - | of the partial option year one of Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 from December 21, |
---|
34 | | - | 2022, to February 7, 2023 in the not -to-exceed amount of $375,880.64. |
---|
35 | | - | (d) Modification No. 7 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option year one of |
---|
36 | | - | Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 for the period from February 8, 2023, through September |
---|
37 | | - | 21, 2023, in the not -to-exceed amount of $1,458,373.60. |
---|
38 | | - | (e) Council approval is required by section 451(b) (1) of the Home Rule Act (D.C. |
---|
39 | | - | Official Code § 1-204.51(b)(1)) as the modifications will increase the value of the contract to |
---|
40 | | - | more than $1 million during a 12- month period. |
---|
41 | | - | (f) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. Without this |
---|
42 | | - | approval, Sasha Bruce Youthworks , Inc. cannot be paid for goods and services provided in |
---|
43 | | - | excess of $1 million for the period September 22, 2022, through September 21, 2023. ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | 2 |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
51 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modifications to Human Care Agreement |
---|
52 | | - | No. CW 93767 with Sasha Bruce Youthworks , Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization |
---|
53 | | - | Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
54 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 47 | + | Todeclaretheexistenceofanemergencywithrespecttotheneedtoapprove |
---|
| 48 | + | ModificationNos.5,6,and7toHumanCareAgreementNo.CW93767with |
---|
| 49 | + | SashaBruceYouthworks,Inc.toprovidepre-andpost-transitionalcarehomesto |
---|
| 50 | + | Districtyouthandtoauthorizepaymentforthegoodsandservicesreceivedandto |
---|
| 51 | + | bereceivedunderthemodifications. |
---|
| 52 | + | RESOLVED,BYTHECOUNCILOFTHEDISTRICTOFCOLUMBIA,That |
---|
| 53 | + | thisresolutionmaybecitedasthe“ModificationstoHumanCareAgreementNo, |
---|
| 54 | + | CW93767withSashaBruceYouthworks,Ine.ApprovalandPaymentAuthorization |
---|
| 55 | + | EmergencyDeclarationResolutionof2023” |
---|
| 56 | + | Sec.2.(a)ThereexistsanimmediateneedtoapproveModificationNos.5,6, |
---|
| 57 | + | and7toHumanCareAgreementNo.CW93767withSashaBruceYouthworks,Inc.to |
---|
| 58 | + | providepre-andpost-transitionalcarehomestoDistrictyouth,andtoauthorizepayment |
---|
| 59 | + | forthegoodsandservicesreceivedandtobereceivedunderthemodifications. |
---|
| 60 | + | (b)ByModificationNo,5,datedSeptember20,2022,theOfficeofContracting |
---|
| 61 | + | andProcurement,onbehalfoftheDepartmentofYouthRehabilitationServices, |
---|
| 62 | + | exercisedapartialoptionyearoneofHumanCareAgreementNo.CW93767forthe |
---|
| 63 | + | 34 |
---|
| 64 | + | 35 |
---|
| 65 | + | 36 |
---|
| 66 | + | 37 |
---|
| 67 | + | 38 |
---|
| 68 | + | 39 |
---|
| 69 | + | 40 |
---|
| 70 | + | 41 |
---|
| 71 | + | 42 |
---|
| 72 | + | 43 |
---|
| 73 | + | 44 |
---|
| 74 | + | 45 |
---|
| 75 | + | 46 |
---|
| 76 | + | 47 |
---|
| 77 | + | 48 |
---|
| 78 | + | 49 |
---|
| 79 | + | 50 |
---|
| 80 | + | 51 |
---|
| 81 | + | 53 |
---|
| 82 | + | 34 |
---|
| 83 | + | 55 |
---|
| 84 | + | 56 |
---|
| 85 | + | periodfromSeptember22,2022throughDecember20,2022inthenot-to-exceedamount |
---|
| 86 | + | of$618,136.96. |
---|
| 87 | + | (©)ByModificationNo.6,datedDecember15,2022,theOfficeofContracting |
---|
| 88 | + | andProcurement,onbehalfoftheDepartmentofYouthRehabilitationServices, |
---|
| 89 | + | extendedthetermofthepartialoptionyearoneofHumanCareAgreementNo. |
---|
| 90 | + | CW93767fromDecember21,2022toFebruary7,2023inthenot-to-exceedamountof |
---|
| 91 | + | $375,880.64. |
---|
| 92 | + | (d)ModificationNo.7isnownecessarytoexercisetheremainderofoptionyear |
---|
| 93 | + | oneofHumanCareAgreementNo.CW93767fortheperiodFebruary8,2023through |
---|
| 94 | + | September21,2023inthenot-to-exceedamountof$1,458,373.60. |
---|
| 95 | + | (e)Councilapprovalisrequiredbysection451(b)(1)oftheDistrictofColumbia |
---|
| 96 | + | HomeRuleAct,approvedDecember24,1973(87Stat.803;D.C.OfficialCode§1- |
---|
| 97 | + | 204.51(b)(1))sincethemodificationswillincreasethevalueofthecontracttomorethan |
---|
| 98 | + | $1millionduringa12-monthperiod |
---|
| 99 | + | (£)Approvalisnecessarytoallowthecontinuationofthesevitalservices. |
---|
| 100 | + | Withoutthisapproval,SashaBruceYouthworks,Inc.cannotbepaidforgoodsand |
---|
| 101 | + | servicesprovidedinexcessof$1millionfortheperiodSeptember22,2022through |
---|
| 102 | + | September21,2023. |
---|
| 103 | + | Sec.3.TheCounciloftheDistrictofColumbiadeterminesthatthe |
---|
| 104 | + | circumstancesenumeratedinsection2constituteemergencycircumstancesmakingit |
---|
| 105 | + | necessarythattheModificationstoHumanCareAgreementNo.CW93767withSasha |
---|
| 106 | + | BruceYouthworks,Inc.ApprovalandPaymentAuthorizationEmergencyActof2023be |
---|
| 107 | + | adoptedafterasinglereading. |
---|
| 108 | + | 37 Sec.4.Thisresolutionshalltakeeffectimmediately. |
---|