ENROLLED ORIGINAL 1 A RESOLUTION 25-34 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA February 7, 2023 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos . 5, 6, and 7 to Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 with Sasha Bruce Youthworks , Inc. to provide pre - and post-transitional care homes to District youth, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the modifications. RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution may be cited as the “Modifications to Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 with Sasha Bruce Youthworks, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification No s. 5, 6, and 7 to Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 with Sasha Bruce Youthworks , Inc. to provide pre - and post-transitional care homes to District youth and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the m odifications. (b) By Modification No. 5, dated September 20, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Youth Rehabilitati on Services, exercised a partial option year one of Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 for the period from September 22, 2022, through December 20, 2022, in the not -to-exceed amount of $618,136.96. (c) By Modification No. 6, dated December 15, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Youth Rehabilitation Services, extended the term of the partial option year one of Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 from December 21, 2022, to February 7, 2023 in the not -to-exceed amount of $375,880.64. (d) Modification No. 7 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option year one of Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 for the period from February 8, 2023, through September 21, 2023, in the not -to-exceed amount of $1,458,373.60. (e) Council approval is required by section 451(b) (1) of the Home Rule Act (D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51(b)(1)) as the modifications will increase the value of the contract to more than $1 million during a 12- month period. (f) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. Without this approval, Sasha Bruce Youthworks , Inc. cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 million for the period September 22, 2022, through September 21, 2023. ENROLLED ORIGINAL 2 Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modifications to Human Care Agreement No. CW 93767 with Sasha Bruce Youthworks , Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.