District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0081 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
21
32
43
5-
6- 1
7-A RESOLUTION
8-
9-25-71
10-
11-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-March 7, 2023
14- To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos .
4+MURIELBOWSER
5+MAYOR
6+January30,2023
7+HonorablePhilMendelson
8+Chairman
9+CounciloftheDistrictofColumbia
10+JohnA.WilsonBuilding
11+1350PennsylvaniaAvenue,NW,Suite504
12+Washington,DC20004
13+DearChairmanMendelson:
14+EnclosedforconsiderationandenactmentbytheCounciloftheDistrictofColumbiaisan
15+emergencybill,the“ModificationstoContractNo.CW95440withDLTSolutions,LLCApproval
16+andPaymentAuthorizationEmergencyActof2023,”andtheaccompanyingemergency
17+declarationresolution.
18+ThelegislationwillapproveModificationNos.1,2,4,5,and6tofullyexerciseoptionyearone
19+ofContractNo.CW95440withDLTSolutions,LLCtoprovideCrowdStrikesoftware
20+subscriptionlicensesandwillauthorizepaymentforthegoodsandservicesreceivedandtobe
21+receivedunderthemodifications.
22+Ifyouhaveanyquestionsregardingthislegislation,pleasehaveyourstaffcontactMareScott,
23+ChiefOperationsOfficer,OfficeofContractingandProcurement,at(202)724-8759.
24+IlookforwardtotheCouncil’spromptandfavorableactionontheenclosedlegislation.
25+Sincagely,
26+furiplBowser 23
27+24
28+25
29+26
30+27
31+28
32+29
33+30
34+31
35+32
36+33
37+34
38+ fhairmanPhilMendelson
39+attherequestoftheMayor
40+APROPOSEDRESOLUTION
41+INTHECOUNCILOFTHEDISTRICTOFCOLUMBIA.
42+TodeclaretheexistenceofanemergencywithrespecttotheneedtoapproveModificationNos
1543 1,2,4,5,and6toContractNo.CW95440withDLTSolutions,LLCtoprovide
16-CrowdStrike software subscription licenses, and to authorize payment for the goods and
17-services received and to be received under the contract .
18-
44+CrowdStrikesoftwaresubscriptionlicensesandtoauthorizepaymentforthegoodsand
45+servicesreceivedandtobereceivedunderthemodifications.
1946 RESOLVED, BYTHECOUNCILOFTHEDISTRICTOFCOLUMBIA, Thatthis
2047 resolutionmaybecitedasthe“ModificationstoContractNo.CW95440withDLTSolutions,
2148 LLCApprovalandPaymentAuthorizationEmergencyDeclarationResolutionof2023”.
2249 Sec.2.(a)ThereexistsanimmediateneedtoapproveModificationNos.1,2,4,5,and6
23-to Contract No. CW95440 with DLT Solutions, LLC to provide CrowdStrike software
24-subscription licenses and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be
50+toContractNo,CW95440withDLTSolutions,LLCtoprovideCrowdStrikesoftware
51+subscriptionlicenses,andtoauthorizepaymentforthegoodsandservicesreceivedandtobe
2552 receivedunderthemodifications.
2653 (b)ByModificationNo.1,datedOctober17,2022,theOfficeofContractingand
27-Procurement (“OCP”), on behalf of the Office of the Chief Technology Officer (“OCTO”),
28-exercised a partial Option Period 1 of Contract No. CW95440 for the period from November 1,
29-2022, through November 30, 2022, in the amount of $1,000,000.
30-(c) By Modification No. 2, dated October 28, 2022, OCP , on behalf of OCTO, exercised
31-another partial Option Period 1 of Contract No. CW95440 for the period from December 1,
32-2022, through December 31, 2022, a t no cost to the District.
33-(d) By Modification No. 4, dated December 13, 2022, OCP , on behalf of OCTO,
34-exercised another partial Option Period 1 of Contract No. CW95440 for the period from January 1, 2023, through February 14, 2023, at no cost to the District.
35-(e) By Modification No. 5, dated January 10, 2023, OCP , on behalf of OCTO, exercised
36-another partial Option Period 1 of Contract No. CW95440 for the period from February 15, 2023, through March 15, 2023, at no cost to the District.
37-(f) Modification No. 6 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of Option Period 1 of
38-Contract No. CW95440 for the period from March 16, 2023, through October 31, 2023, in the
39-amount of $ 364,691.60, which will increase t he total amount for Option Period 1 to
40-$1,364,691.60. ENROLLED ORIGINAL
41-
42-
43-
44-
45- 2
54+Procurement,onbehalfoftheOfficeoftheChiefTechnologyOfficer,partiallyexercisedoption
55+yearoneofContractNo.(CW95440fortheperiodNovember1,2022throughNovember30,
56+2022intheamountof$1,000,000.
57+(©)ByModificationNo,2,datedOctober28,2022,theOfficeofContractingand
58+Procurement,onbehalfoftheOfficeoftheChiefTechnologyOfficer,partiallyexercisedoption 35
59+36
60+37
61+38
62+39
63+40
64+41
65+42
66+4B
67+44
68+45
69+46
70+47
71+48
72+49
73+50
74+51
75+32
76+53
77+54
78+55
79+56
80+yearoneofContractNo.CW95440fortheperiodDecember1,2022throughDecember31,
81+2022atnocosttotheDistrict.
82+(4)ByModificationNo.4,datedDecember13,2022,theOfficeofContractingand
83+Procurement,onbehalfoftheOfficeoftheChiefTechnologyOfficer,partiallyexercisedoption
84+yearoneofContractNo.CW95440fortheperiodJanuary1,2023throughFebruary14,2023at
85+nocosttotheDistrict.
86+(©)ByModificationNo.5,datedJanuary10,2023,theOfficeofContractingand
87+Procurement,onbehalfoftheOfficeoftheChiefTechnologyOfficer,partiallyexercisedoption
88+yearoneofContractNo.CW95440fortheperiodFebruary15,2023throughMarch15,2023at
89+nocosttotheDistrict.
90+(0)ModificationNo.6isnownecessarytoexercisetheremainderofoptionyearoneof
91+ContractNo.CW95440fortheperiodMarch16,2023throughOctober31,2023intheamount
92+of$1,364,691.60.
4693 (g)Undersection451(b)(1)oftheDistrictofColumbiaHomeRuleAct,approved
47-December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1204.51(b)(1)), Council approval is
48-necessary as the modification will increase the value of the contract to more than $1 million
94+December24,1973(87Stat.803;D.C.OfficialCode§1-204.51(b)(1)),Councilapprovalis
95+necessarysincethemodificationwillincreasethevalueofthecontracttomorethan$1million
4996 duringa12-monthperiod.
5097 (h)Approvalisnecessarytoallowthecontinuationofthesevitalservices.Without
5198 approval,DLTSolutions,LLCcannotbepaidforgoodsandservicesprovidedinexcessof$1
52-million for the period November 1, 2022 t hrough October 31, 2023.
53-
99+millionfortheperiodNovember1,2022throughOctober31,2023
54100 Sec.3.TheCounciloftheDistrictofColumbiadeterminesthatthecircumstances
55101 enumeratedinsection2constituteemergencycircumstancesmakingitnecessarythatthe
56-Modifications to Contract No. CW95440 with DLT Solutions, LLC Approval and Payment
57-Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading.
58-
59-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
102+57ModificationstoContractNo.CW95440withDLTSolutions,LLCApprovalandPayment
103+58AuthorizationEmergencyActof2023beadoptedafterasinglereading.
104+59 Sec.4.Thisresolutionshalltakeeffectimmediately.