District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0081 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-71  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
March 7, 2023 
 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos	. 
1, 2, 4, 5, and 6 to Contract No. CW95440 with DLT Solutions, LLC to provide 
CrowdStrike software subscription licenses, and to authorize payment for the goods and 
services received and to be received under the contract	. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Modification	s to Contract No. CW95440 with DLT Solutions, 
LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos	. 1, 2, 4, 5, and 6 
to Contract No. CW95440 with DLT Solutions, LLC to provide CrowdStrike software 
subscription licenses and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be 
received under the modifications. 
(b)  By Modification No. 1, dat	ed October 17, 2022, t	he Office of Contracting and 
Procurement (“OCP”), on behalf of the Office of the Chief Technology Officer (“OCTO”), 
exercised a partial Option Period 1 of Contract No. CW95440 for the period from November 1, 
2022, through November 30, 2022, in the amount of $1,000,000. 
(c)  By Modification No. 2, dated October 28, 2022, OCP	, on behalf of OCTO, exercised 
another partial Option Period 1 of Contract No. CW95440 for the period from December 1, 
2022, through December 31, 2022, a	t no cost to the District. 
(d)  By Modification No. 4, dated December 13, 2022, OCP	, on behalf of OCTO, 
exercised another partial Option Period 1 of Contract No. CW95440 for the period from January 1, 2023, through February 14, 2023, at no cost to the District. 
(e)  By Modification No. 5, dated January 10, 2023, OCP	, on behalf of OCTO, exercised 
another partial Option Period 1 of Contract No. CW95440 for the period from February 15, 2023, through March 15, 2023, at no cost to the District. 
(f)  Modification No. 6 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of Option Period 1 of 
Contract No. CW95440 for the period from March 16, 2023, through October 31, 2023, in the 
amount of $ 364,691.60, which will increase t he total amount for Option Period 1 to 
$1,364,691.60.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
(g)  Under section 451(b)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1–	204.51(b)(1)), Council approval is 
necessary as the modification will increase the value of the contract to more than $1 million 
during a 12- month period.   
 (h)  Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services.  Without 
approval, DLT Solutions, LLC cannot be paid for goods and serv ices provided in excess of $1 
million for the period November 1, 2022 t hrough October 31, 2023. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 
Modifications to Contract No. CW95440 with DLT Solutions, LLC Approval and Payment 
Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.