1 ______________________________ 1 C ouncilmember Charles Allen 2 3 4 5 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 7 _______ 8 9 10 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 12 ______________ 13 14 15 To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 16 to amend the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 2005 to 17 provide that money in the Clean Rivers Impervious Area Charge Assistance Fund may be 18 provided to eligible residential customers of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer 19 Authority for payment of amounts due to the District of Columbia Water and Sewer 20 Authority; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 21 2014 to establish a December 31, 2022, deadline for the first submission of proposed 22 stewardship plans to the Department of Energy and Environment, and to clarify that 23 manufacturers must accept covered electronic equipment for recycling and reuse where a 24 customer purchases the same type of electronic equipment from the manufacturer. 25 26 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That thi s 27 resolution may be cited as the “CRIAC Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency 28 Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 29 Sec. 2. (a) On November 1, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund 30 Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective November 28, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-0675; 69 DCR 31 014786) (“emergency measure”). The emergency measure is set to expire on February 20, 2023. 32 (b) On November 15, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund Temporary 33 Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on December 8, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-0695; 69 DCR 015129) 34 (“temporary measure”). The temporary measure has been transmitted to Congress and has a 35 projected law date of March 8, 2023. 36 2 (c) This congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the 37 law between the expiration of the emergency measure and the effective date of the temporary 38 measure. 39 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 40 enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the CRIAC 41 Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a 42 single reading. 43 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 44