1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-25 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | February 7, 2023 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
17 | | - | to amend the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 2005 to |
---|
18 | | - | provide that money in the Clean Rivers Impervious Area Charge Assistance Fund may be |
---|
19 | | - | provided to eligible residential customers of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer |
---|
20 | | - | Authority for payment of amounts due to the District of Columbia Water and Sewer |
---|
21 | | - | Authority; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of |
---|
22 | | - | 2014 to establish a December 31, 2022, deadline for the first submission of proposed |
---|
23 | | - | stewardship plans to the Department of Energy and Environment, and to clarify that |
---|
24 | | - | manufacturers must accept covered electronic equipment for recycling and reuse where a |
---|
25 | | - | customer purchases the same type of electronic equipment from the manufacturer. |
---|
26 | | - | |
---|
27 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
28 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “ CRIAC Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency |
---|
29 | | - | Declaration Resolution of 2023” . |
---|
30 | | - | |
---|
31 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On November 1, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund |
---|
32 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective November 2 2, 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 675; 69 DCR |
---|
33 | | - | 14786) (“emergency measure”). The emergency measure is set to expire on February 20, 2023. |
---|
34 | | - | (b) On November 15, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund Temporary |
---|
35 | | - | Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on December 8, 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 695; 69 DCR 15129) |
---|
36 | | - | (“temporary measure”). The temporary measure has been transmitted to Congress and has a |
---|
37 | | - | projected law date of March 8, 2023. |
---|
38 | | - | (c) This congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the |
---|
39 | | - | law between the expiration of the emergency measure and the effective date of the temporary |
---|
40 | | - | measure. |
---|
41 | | - | |
---|
42 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances |
---|
43 | | - | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the CRIAC |
---|
44 | | - | Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 202 3 be adopted after a |
---|
45 | | - | single reading. |
---|
46 | | - | |
---|
47 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 1 | + | |
---|
| 2 | + | 1 |
---|
| 3 | + | ______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 4 | + | C ouncilmember Charles Allen 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | _______ 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | ______________ 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | to amend the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 2005 to 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | provide that money in the Clean Rivers Impervious Area Charge Assistance Fund may be 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | provided to eligible residential customers of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | Authority for payment of amounts due to the District of Columbia Water and Sewer 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | Authority; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | 2014 to establish a December 31, 2022, deadline for the first submission of proposed 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | stewardship plans to the Department of Energy and Environment, and to clarify that 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | manufacturers must accept covered electronic equipment for recycling and reuse where a 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | customer purchases the same type of electronic equipment from the manufacturer. 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That thi s 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | resolution may be cited as the “CRIAC Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On November 1, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective November 28, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-0675; 69 DCR 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | 014786) (“emergency measure”). The emergency measure is set to expire on February 20, 2023. 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | (b) On November 15, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund Temporary 33 |
---|
| 36 | + | Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on December 8, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-0695; 69 DCR 015129) 34 |
---|
| 37 | + | (“temporary measure”). The temporary measure has been transmitted to Congress and has a 35 |
---|
| 38 | + | projected law date of March 8, 2023. 36 |
---|
| 39 | + | 2 |
---|
| 40 | + | (c) This congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | law between the expiration of the emergency measure and the effective date of the temporary 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | measure. 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the CRIAC 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | single reading. 43 |
---|
| 47 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 44 |
---|