District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0089 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-25  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 7, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 2005 to 
provide that money in the Clean Rivers Impervious Area Charge Assistance Fund may be 
provided to eligible residential customers of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer 
Authority for payment of amounts due to the District of Columbia Water and Sewer 
Authority; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 
2014 to establish a December 31, 2022, deadline for the first submission of proposed 
stewardship plans to the Department of Energy and Environment, and to clarify that 
manufacturers must accept covered electronic equipment for recycling and reuse where a 
customer purchases the same type of electronic equipment from the manufacturer. 
 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “	CRIAC Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”	. 
 
 Sec. 2. (a) On November 1, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective November 2	2, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-	675; 69 DCR 
14786) (“emergency measure”). The emergency measure is set to expire on February 20, 2023. 
 (b) On November 15, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund Temporary 
Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on December 8, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-	695; 69 DCR 15129) 
(“temporary measure”). The temporary measure has been transmitted to Congress and has a 
projected law date of March 8, 2023. 
 (c) This congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the 
law between the expiration of the emergency measure and the effective date of the temporary 
measure. 
 
 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the CRIAC 
Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 202	3 be adopted after a 
single reading.   
 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.