8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-63 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | February 7, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to confirm the appointment of |
---|
16 | | - | Ms. Norma Hutcheson to the District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government |
---|
17 | | - | Accountability. |
---|
18 | | - | |
---|
19 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
20 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “ District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government |
---|
21 | | - | Accountability Norma Hutcheson Confirmation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
22 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) The Board of Ethics and Government Accountability (“BEGA”) investigates |
---|
23 | | - | alleged ethics law violations by District government employees and public officials, provides binding ethics advice, and conducts mandatory training on the District government’s Code of |
---|
24 | | - | Conduct. The Office of Open Government is an independent office within BEGA that enforces |
---|
25 | | - | the Open Meetings Act, monitors the District’s Freedom of Information Act compliance, and |
---|
26 | | - | assists agencies with implementing open government practices. |
---|
27 | | - | (b) Section 203 of the Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Establishment and |
---|
28 | | - | Comprehensive Ethics Reform Amendment Act of 2011, effective April 27, 2012 (D.C. Law 19- |
---|
29 | | - | 124; D.C. Official Code § 1-1162.03), provides that members shall be appointed for 6- year terms |
---|
30 | | - | with the advice and consent of the Council. |
---|
31 | | - | (c) On October 21, 2022, Chairman Mendelson introduced, at the request of the Mayor, |
---|
32 | | - | the District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Norma Hutcheson |
---|
33 | | - | Confirmation Resolution of 2022 ( PR24-998, reintroduced in Council Period 25 as PR25- 10), to |
---|
34 | | - | confirm Norma Hutcheson to BEGA for a 6-year term, which started the 90-day clock, ending |
---|
35 | | - | February 8, 2023, for Council review. On January 30, 2023, t he Committee on Executive |
---|
36 | | - | Administration and Labor held a public roundtable on PR25-10. |
---|
37 | | - | (d) If Ms. Hutcheson is not confirmed by February 8, 2023, her nomination will be |
---|
38 | | - | deemed disapproved. |
---|
39 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 6 | + | ______________________ 1 |
---|
| 7 | + | Councilmember Anita Bonds 2 |
---|
| 8 | + | 3 |
---|
| 9 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 4 |
---|
| 10 | + | 5 |
---|
| 11 | + | ___________ 6 |
---|
| 12 | + | 7 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8 |
---|
| 14 | + | 9 |
---|
| 15 | + | _______________________ 10 |
---|
| 16 | + | 11 |
---|
| 17 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to confirm the appointment of 12 |
---|
| 18 | + | Ms. Norma Hutcheson to the District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government 13 |
---|
| 19 | + | Accountability. 14 |
---|
| 20 | + | 15 |
---|
| 21 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 16 |
---|
| 22 | + | resolution may be cited as the “District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government 17 |
---|
| 23 | + | Accountability Norma Hutcheson Confirmation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 18 |
---|
| 24 | + | Sec. 2. (a) The District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government Accountability 19 |
---|
| 25 | + | (“BEGA”) investigates alleged ethics law violations by District government employees and 20 |
---|
| 26 | + | public officials, provides binding ethics advice, and conducts mandatory training on the District 21 |
---|
| 27 | + | government’s Code of Conduct. The Office of Open Government is an independent office within 22 |
---|
| 28 | + | BEGA that enforces the Open Meetings Act, monitors the District’s Freedom of Information Act 23 |
---|
| 29 | + | compliance, and assists agencies with implementing open government practices. 24 |
---|
| 30 | + | (b) Section 203 of the Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Establishment and 25 |
---|
| 31 | + | Comprehensive Ethics Reform Amendment Act of 2011, effective April 27, 2012 (D.C. Law 19- 26 |
---|
| 32 | + | 124; D.C. Official Code § 1-1162.03), provides that members shall be appointed for 6-year terms 27 |
---|
| 33 | + | with the advice and consent of the Council. 28 |
---|
| 34 | + | (c) On October 21, 2022, Chairman Mendelson introduced, at the request of the Mayor, 29 |
---|
| 35 | + | PR24-998 (reintroduced in Council Period 25 as PR25-0010), the District of Columbia Board of 30 |
---|
44 | | - | 2 |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
47 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the District of Columbia Board of Ethics and |
---|
48 | | - | Government Accountability Norma Hutcheson Emergency Confirmation Resolution of 2023 be |
---|
49 | | - | adopted on an emergency basis. |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 40 | + | Ethics and Government Accountability Norma Hutcheson Confirmation Resolution of 2022, to 31 |
---|
| 41 | + | confirm Norma Hutcheson to BEGA for a 6-year term, which started the 90-day clock, ending 32 |
---|
| 42 | + | February 8, 2023, for Council review of her nomination. On January 30, 2023, the Committee on 33 |
---|
| 43 | + | Executive Administration and Labor held a public roundtable on PR25-0010. 34 |
---|
| 44 | + | (d) If Ms. Hutcheson is not confirmed by February 8, 2023, her nomination will be 35 |
---|
| 45 | + | deemed disapproved. 36 |
---|
| 46 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 37 |
---|
| 47 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the District 38 |
---|
| 48 | + | of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Norma Hutcheson Emergency 39 |
---|
| 49 | + | Confirmation Resolution of 2023 be adopted on an emergency basis. 40 |
---|
| 50 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 41 |
---|