District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0091 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-63  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 7, 2023 
 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to confirm the appointment of 
Ms. Norma Hutcheson to the District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government 
Accountability. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “	District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government 
Accountability Norma Hutcheson Confirmation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 Sec. 2. (a) The Board of Ethics and Government Accountability (“BEGA”) investigates 
alleged ethics law violations by District government employees and public officials, provides binding ethics advice, and conducts mandatory training on the District government’s Code of 
Conduct. The Office of Open Government is an independent office within BEGA that enforces 
the Open Meetings Act, monitors the District’s Freedom of Information Act compliance, and 
assists agencies with implementing open government practices. 
(b) Section 203 of the Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Establishment and 
Comprehensive Ethics Reform Amendment Act of 2011, effective April 27, 2012 (D.C. Law 19- 
124; D.C. Official Code § 1-1162.03), provides that members shall be appointed for 6-	year terms 
with the advice and consent of the Council. 
(c) On October 21, 2022, Chairman Mendelson introduced, at the request of the Mayor, 
the District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Norma Hutcheson 
Confirmation Resolution of 2022 (	PR24-998, reintroduced in Council Period 25 as PR25-	10), to 
confirm Norma Hutcheson to BEGA for a 6-year term, which started the 90-day clock, ending 
February 8, 2023, for Council review. On January 30, 2023, t	he Committee on Executive 
Administration and Labor held a public roundtable on PR25-10. 
(d) If Ms. Hutcheson is not confirmed by February 8, 2023, her nomination will be 
deemed disapproved.  
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the District of Columbia Board of Ethics and 
Government Accountability Norma Hutcheson Emergency Confirmation Resolution of 2023 be 
adopted on an emergency basis. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.