| 4 | + | ___________________________________ 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | ___________ 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | __________________ 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, with respect to congressional review, with respect to 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | the need to continue foreclosure protections for homeowners who applied for funding from 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | the DC Homeowner Assistance Fund program before September 30, 2022 and whose 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | application remains under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | and to require notices continue to be sent to homeowners informing them of the DC HAF 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | program prior to a foreclosure action. 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023.” 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to continue pandemic-related foreclosure 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | moratorium for certain homeowners who applied for funding from the DC Homeowner 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | Assistance Fund (“DC HAF”) program before September 30, 2022, and whose application 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | remains under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, and to require 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | regular application status updates be provided to those homeowners until their applications are 33 |
---|
| 36 | + | resolved. 34 |
---|
| 37 | + | (b) The District received $50 million in federal assistance through the American Rescue 35 |
---|
| 38 | + | Plan Act to assist low- and moderate-income homeowners who experienced new or exacerbated 36 2 |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-21 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | February 7, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
18 | | - | to preserve foreclosure protections for homeowners who applied for funding from the DC |
---|
19 | | - | Homeowner Assistance Fund program before September 30, 2022 and whose application |
---|
20 | | - | remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, and to require |
---|
21 | | - | that notices continue to be sent to homeowners informing them of the DC Homeowner |
---|
22 | | - | Assistance Fund program before a foreclosure action. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
25 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023.” |
---|
26 | | - | |
---|
27 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) The Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination |
---|
28 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective November 22, 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 674; D.C. |
---|
29 | | - | Official Code § 42- 851.01), is set to expire on February 20, 2023. |
---|
30 | | - | (b) The Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination |
---|
31 | | - | Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on December 8, 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 693; 69 DCR |
---|
32 | | - | 15121), is not projected to become law until March 8, 2023, due to a delay in congressional |
---|
33 | | - | transmittal because of the change of sessions. |
---|
34 | | - | |
---|
35 | | - | (c) A congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in the law and |
---|
36 | | - | protect homeowners from foreclosures as they continue to await approvals and payments from the Department of Housing and Community Development . |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances |
---|
39 | | - | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 should be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
| 40 | + | financial hardships as a result of the pandemic and, in June, the Department of Housing and 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | Community Development (“DHCD”) opened applications for DC’s Homeowner Assistance 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | Fund program. 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | (c) In June 2022, the Council extended the pandemic-related foreclosure moratorium to 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | align with the opening of the DC HAF program and required homeowners to submit an 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | application for DC HAF assistance to cure housing debts by September 30, 2022 in order to 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | remain eligible for foreclosure protections beyond that initial deadline; as of September 30, 43 |
---|
| 47 | + | 2022, DHCD had approximately 1,000 applications under review and awaiting potential payment 44 |
---|
| 48 | + | necessitating the Council to extend the foreclosure moratorium protections previously guaranteed 45 |
---|
| 49 | + | to those homeowners who met the September 30, 2022 deadline for their DC HAF applications. 46 |
---|
| 50 | + | (d) The Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination 47 |
---|
| 51 | + | Emergency Amendment Act of 2022 was passed November 1, 2022 and is set to expire February 48 |
---|
| 52 | + | 20, 2023. 49 |
---|
| 53 | + | (e) The Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination 50 |
---|
| 54 | + | Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, passed November 15, 2022, is not projected to become law 51 |
---|
| 55 | + | until March 8 due to delays in congressional transmittals at the change of sessions. 52 |
---|
| 56 | + | (f) A congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in the law and protect 53 |
---|
| 57 | + | homeowners from foreclosures as they continue to await approvals and payments from DHCD. 54 |
---|
| 58 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 55 |
---|
| 59 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 56 |
---|
| 60 | + | Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency 57 |
---|
| 61 | + | Amendment Act of 2022 should be adopted after a single reading. 58 |
---|
| 62 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 59 |
---|